12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
19.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
05.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
03.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
30.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
26.02.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
29.01.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.03.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.02.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
29.11.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2013 |
First examination report |
|
19.07.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
04.06.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
03.05.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |