Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019007848 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201816122659 | 05.09.2018 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | US201715709538 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9794807 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | B2 | US2014003332 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9350085 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2013162493 | 27.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213435604 | 30.03.2012 | US201161579401 | 22.12.2011 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9621330 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2017 | B2 | US2013137381 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213436046 | 30.03.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9106415 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2015 | B2 | US2013136039 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213626108 | 25.09.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9225500 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2015 | B2 | US2013135986 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213615913 | 14.09.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10396845 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | B2 | US2017179999 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213436046 | 30.03.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | US201715444633 | 28.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10243267 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2016261044 | 08.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213435604 | 30.03.2012 | US201161579401 | 22.12.2011 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | US201615155572 | 16.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10091673 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | B2 | US2018014213 | 11.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | US201715709538 | 20.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101446628B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B1 | KR20140002456 | 08.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2725872 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | B1 | EP2725872 | 23.07.2014 | A3 | EP2725872 | 30.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12006163 | 30.08.2012 | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2680635 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2016 | B1 | EP2680635 | 09.04.2014 | A3 | EP2680635 | 01.01.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103139802B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | B | CN103139802 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1184304 | 17.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI474672B | 21.02.2015 | B | TW201325139 | 16.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535668 | 28.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9380645 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2013136163 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10425117 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2013135985 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535199 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101436975B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B1 | KR20130061048 | 10.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535199 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101413000B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2014 | B1 | KR20130061047 | 10.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2600685 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | A3 | EP2600685 | 05.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213535199 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103236865B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B | CN103236865 | 07.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535199 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103138795B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2016 | B | CN103138795 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2600686 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B1 | EP2600686 | 21.08.2013 | A3 | EP2600686 | 05.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN203104432U | 31.07.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1182544 | 29.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI493938B | 21.07.2015 | B | TW201322702 | 01.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535199 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI487342B | 01.06.2015 | B | TW201322704 | 01.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213535196 | 27.06.2012 | US201161565469 | 30.11.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP2725872 |