EP2574402 - NOZZLE HAVING CYLINDER WITH CODING AND CONTROL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/14] | Nozzle having cylinder with coding and control elements | ||
[2014/29] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPPENDORF AG Barkhausenweg 1 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löhn, Jürgen Ramscher Weg 8 27419 Gross Meckelsen / DE | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/14] | Siemons, Norbert, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12006173.4 | 29.08.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | DE201110114591 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011114591 | [2013/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574402 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574402 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, B01L3/00, G01N35/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
B01L3/0217 (EP);
B01L3/0234 (EP);
B01L3/5453 (EP);
B01L2300/0609 (EP);
B01L3/0279 (EP);
G01N2035/00811 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | B01L3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | SPRITZE MIT SPRITZENZYLINDER MIT KODIERUNG UND PRÜFELEMENTEN | [2014/29] | English: | NOZZLE HAVING CYLINDER WITH CODING AND CONTROL ELEMENTS | [2014/29] | French: | SERINGUE AVEC CYLINDRE AVEC CODAGE ET DES ELEMENTS DE CONTROLES | [2014/29] |
Former [2013/14] | Spritze mit Spritzenzylinder mit Kodierung und Prüfelementen | ||
Former [2013/14] | Nozzle having cylinder with coding and control elements | ||
Former [2013/14] | Seringue avec cylindre avec codage et des elements de controles | Examination procedure | 03.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 04.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Ritter GmbH Kaufbeurer Strasse 55 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE Opponent's representative Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [2016/01] | 22.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.04.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.03.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.03.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/18] | Appeal following opposition | 27.04.2018 | Appeal received No. T1119/18 | 22.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2012 | AL | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | IE | 29.08.2015 | LU | 29.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.08.2012 | |
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.08.2012 | |
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.08.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0657216 (EPPENDORF GERAETEBAU NETHELER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0691158 (BRAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102009034897 (EPPENDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011088493 (BLUMENTRITT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | DE2926691 | EP0657216 | US5620661 | EP0657216 | EP0691158 | EP0951306 | EP2236207 | EP2279791 |