EP2574546 - Hybriddrehflügelflugzeug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moret, Robin A13 Résidence les Deux Lions Avenue Donnadieu 13300 Salon de Provence / FR | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés 1330, Rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichauny, Bât B2 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | ||
Former [2013/14] | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associés Europarc de Pichaury Bât. B2 - 1er Et. 1330 Rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12006365.6 | 11.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | FR20110002947 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1102947 | [2013/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574546 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574546 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/26, B64C27/82, B64C27/12 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
B64C27/26 (EP,US);
B64D35/04 (KR);
B64C27/12 (EP,US);
B64C27/22 (KR);
B64C27/82 (EP,US);
B64C29/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | Hybrid rotary wing aircraft | [2013/14] | English: | Hybriddrehflügelflugzeug | [2013/14] | French: | Aéronef hybride à voilure tournante | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2012 | AL | 19.11.2014 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 11.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2665859 (JAMES PAPADAKOS PETER) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,6 * * column 1, lines 21-33, 50-55 * * column 3, lines 43-72 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 7 *; | [A]US2005151001 (LOPER ARTHUR W [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 6 *; | [A]GB215366 (ERICH OTTO) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 73-87 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2197629 (WESTLAND GROUP PLC) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3-5 * * voir explication de la Fig. 3 à la page 7 *; | [A]GB895590 (AGUSTA AERONAUT COSTR) [A] 1,6 * figure 2 * * page 1, lines 80-85 * | by applicant | EP2148814 | EP2105378 | US3448946 | US3105659 | US2002011539 | CN1098688 | US2665859 | US2005151001 | GB215366 | GB2197629 | GB895590 |