Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2586331 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | B1 | EP2586331 | 01.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202011107215 | 27.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202011107215U | 19.12.2011 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202011107215 | 27.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2545512T | 11.09.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE202011107215 | 27.10.2011 |