EP2586331 - Standing furniture with leg holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urban, Günter Kleiner Öhler 2 59909 Bestwig / DE | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Kayser, Christoph Kayser & Cobet Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Am Borsigturm 9 13507 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Kayser, Christoph Kayser & Cobet Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Am Borsigturm 53 13507 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12006431.6 | 13.09.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | DE201120107215U | 27.10.2011 Original published format: DE 202011107215 U | [2013/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586331 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586331 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47B13/02 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A47B13/023 (EP);
A47B13/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2013/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Standmöbel mit Beinhalterung | [2013/18] | English: | Standing furniture with leg holder | [2013/18] | French: | Meuble sur pied avec support pour pied | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 29.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 17.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2012 | AL | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MK | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | RS | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | SM | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.09.2012 | |
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.09.2012 | |
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 20.05.2015 | |
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 20.05.2015 | |
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202006013514U (BFR PROMOTION UND FREIZEITARTI [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2008054141 (KOEHLER EDWIN T [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1370691 (WEST ALLOY DIECASTINGS) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 90; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1053700 |