EP2574711 - Tower for a wind energy facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Service GmbH Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE | [2022/10] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Service GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 (Oval Office) 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states REpower Systems SE Alsterkrugchaussee 378 22335 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weltkamp, Roland Östringer Weg 38 49090 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Stephan Hartumer Straße 4 32479 Hille / DE | 03 /
Hinz, Uwe Grüner Weg 17 25795 Weddingstedt / DE | [2013/43] |
Former [2013/14] | 01 /
Weltkamp, Roland Östringer Weg 38 49090 Osnabrück / AT | ||
02 /
Schäfer, Stephan Hartumer Straße 4 32479 Hille / DE | |||
03 /
Hinz, Uwe Grüner Weg 17 25795 Weddingstedt / DE | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2017/29] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/14] | Hausfeld, Norbert, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Beselerstraße 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12006627.9 | 25.08.2004 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | DE20031039438 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339438 | [2013/14] | Previously filed application, date | WO2004EP09486 | 25.08.2004 | [2013/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574711 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574711 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2574711 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/20, E04H12/08, E02D27/42 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
E02D27/42 (EP,US);
E02B17/027 (EP,US);
E02D27/425 (EP,US);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D80/85 (EP,US);
E02B2017/006 (EP,US);
E02B2017/0091 (EP,US);
E04H2012/006 (EP,US);
F03D9/255 (EP,US);
F05B2240/40 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (EP,US);
F05B2240/9121 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | E04H12/08, F03D11/04, E02D27/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2013/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turm für eine Windenergieanlage | [2013/14] | English: | Tower for a wind energy facility | [2013/14] | French: | Tour pour une éolienne | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04764463.8 / EP1658408 | Divisional application(s) | EP17181879.2 / EP3272970 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040764463) is 15.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2018
28.01.2020
WITHDRAWN Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Ørsted Wind Power A/S c/o DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK Opponent's representative Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | 03
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Rambøll Danmark A/S Hannemanns Allé 53 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2018
28.01.2020
WITHDRAWN Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | ||
02
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Ørsted Wind Power A/S c/o DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK Opponent's representative Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
03
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Rambøll Danmark A/S Hannemanns Allé 53 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | |||
Former [2020/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2018
28.01.2020
WITHDRAWN Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | ||
02
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Ørsted Wind Power A/S c/o DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK Opponent's representative Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
03
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Rambøll Danmark A/S Hannemanns Allé 53 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | |||
Former [2018/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | ||
02
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Ørsted Wind Power A/S c/o DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK Opponent's representative Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
03
19.04.2018
24.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Rambøll Danmark A/S Hannemanns Allé 53 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | |||
Former [2018/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.2018
Siemens Wind Power GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Wind Power GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | ||
02
19.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Ørsted Wind Power A/S c/o DONG Energy A/S Kraftværksvej 53 Skærbæk 7000 Fredericia / DK Opponent's representative Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
03
19.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Rambøll Danmark A/S Hannemanns Allé 53 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | 07.05.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.09.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.01.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.06.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T0820/20 | 11.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 30.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T0820/20 | 03.06.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2004 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | AT | 25.08.2017 | LU | 25.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.08.2004 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.08.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.08.2004 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.08.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.08.2004 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.08.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 25.08.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 25.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE736454 (WILHELM TEUBERT DR ING) [XD] 1 * figure . *; | [Y]BE451404 (PORSCHE KG) [Y] 1-5,8-13,15,16 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR901698 (PORSCHE KG) [A] 1-3,5,6,12,16 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2597161 (MARQUET DOMINIQUE [FR]) [Y] 5,6,8 * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO0238890 (BEAIRD IND INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-13,15,16 * figure 2 *; | [XYI] - MATTHIAS KYNAST ET AL, "BeverWIND: Rettung eines Windrades", WINDBRIEF SÜDWESTFALEN, no. 31, (20020901), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.windinvestor.de/pdf/wb31_net.pdf, (20130218), XP055053652 [X] 1-4,7,9,10,16 * page 7 * [Y] 5,6,8 [I] 13,14 | [AOP] - Pierre-Jean Cavey ET AL, "L'aérogénérateur 800KVA BEST- Romani", (20130201), URL: http://eolienne.cavey.org/fr/index_fr.php, (20130218), XP055053662 [AOP] 1-4,11,12,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE736454 | EP0821161 | DE19802210 | Opposition | BE451404 | DE739454 | FR901698 | US4403916 | JPS58186059 | US4621949 | FR2597161 | US5356239 | US5669735 | DE20109981U | WO0238890 | DE10061916 | US6470645 | WO03069099 | US3638436 | US3685300 | US4516881 | US4519725 | US4543014 | GB2267525 | DE9406809U | DE9417738U | GB2366820 | DE10111280 | WO2005021897 | DE542902 | DE736454 | CH233255 | FR921439 | US2705061 | US3895471 | DE2804711 | JPS61200471U | US4646505 | DE8704779U | DE29710502U | DE19802210 | WO0210589 | JP2002115257 | DE10230273 | - Anyonmous, "Wind Brief", Windbrief Sudwestfalen, vol. 31, (20020901), pages 1 - 16, XP055484805 | - "L'aérogénérateur 800KVA BEST- Romani", Eolienne, (19580000), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://eolienne.cavey.org/fr/index_fr.php, XP055053662 | - "DESIGN OF OFFSHORE WIND TURBINE STRUCTURES", DNV-OS-J101, (20040200), XP055371574 | - L'aerogenerateur 800 KVA BEST - Romani, Nogent-le-Roi ( France, (19580000), pages 1 - 3, XP055486998 | - JENS WIEMANN et al., JENS WIEMANN et al., Wiemann, Grundung von Offshore- Windenergieanlagen - Gründungskonzepte und geotechnische Grundlagen, (20020000), pages 38 - 41, XP055487026 | - "Guidelines for Design of Wind Turbines", Det Norske Veritas and Risø National Laboratory, (20020000), pages 1 - 285, URL: http://ns7.freeheberg.com/~mach085/Guidelines_for_Design_of_Wind_Turbines.pdf, XP055013796 | - R. CASCH et al., Wind power plants, Berlin, (19910000), pages 1 - 6 , 29-61 and 197-207 | - anonym, Windbrief Sudwestfalen, (20020900), pages 1 - 16, XP055484805 | - ALEXANDER BLAKE, "Plates and Flanges", Practical stress analysis in engineering design, Marcel Dekker, pages 444, 447 - 448, XP055484808 | - L.H. MARTIN et al., "Chapter 5 Laterally Unrestrained Beams", Structural Design of Steelwork to EN 1993 and EN 1994, Elsevier, (20080000), pages 145 - 146, 222 - 223, XP055484810 | - Anonymous, "Design of steel structures", Norsok Standard, Rev. 1, (19981200), pages 1, 43, 44, 75 - 77, XP055484811 | - "Recommended Practice for Planning, Designing, and Constructing Fixed Offshore Platforms - Load and Resistance Factor Design (supplement 1)", American Petroleum Institute, (19970401), XP055371367 | - MATTHIAS KYNAST et al., "BeverWIND: Rettung eines Windrades", Wind- brief Südwestfalen, (20020901), pages 1 - 15, XP055053652 | - Malcolm D.J, "WindPACT Rotor Design Study: Hybrid Tower Design", SUBCONTRACTOR REPORT, (20040400), pages 1 - 44, XP055480794 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2172/15007349 | - MATTHIAS KYNAST et al., "BeverWIND: Rettung eines Windrades", Wind- brief Südwestfalen, (20020901), pages 1 - 15 | - Malcolm D.J, "WindPACT Rotor Design Study: Hybrid Tower Design", SUBCONTRACTOR REPORT, (20040400), pages 1 - 44 | - Mitzlaff, A. et al: Gründungsstrukturen für Offshore-Windenergieanlagen, HANSA | - Standard Baugrunderkundung | - DNV-OS-J101 draft February 2004 | - Statement Hans J. Riber, LIC Engineering | - Quast P.: Gruendungen fuer Offshore-Windenergieanlagen, EFUC Konferenz 2003 | - Essener Geotechnik-Kolloquim am 10.12.2002, Monopilegruendungen von Offshore.Windenergieanlagen | - Windtech 2001 Konferenz Husum, Windkraft im Meer- Neue Wege in der Offshore-Technik | - L'aerogenerateur 800 KVA BEST - Romani, Nogent-le-Roi | - Wiemann J. et al: Gruendung von Offshore-Windenergieanlagen - Gruendungskonzepte und geotechnische Grundlagen | - Gash, R. et al: Wind power plants, Solarpraxis AG | - NASA Technical Translation of Experimental Aerogenerator Type B.E.S.T. | - Eolienne- Nogent-Le-Roi | - Design of steel structures, Norsok Standard, Rev 1, December 1998 | - Practical stress analysis in engineering design, Alexander Blake, Textbook published by Marcel Dekker Inc., 1990 | - Structural design of steelwork to EN 1993 and EN 1994 | - American Petroleum Institute: Supplement 1 to Recommended Practice for Planning, Designing, and Constructing Fixed Offshore Platforms | - Calculations of force transfer |