EP2574563 - Gespritzter Dekorbehälter und Spritzform für seine Herstellung [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cep Tubes Route du Tremblant 63550 Saint Remy Sur Durolle / FR | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dambricourt, M. Géry La Verchère 63300 Escoutoux / FR | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12006841.6 | 01.10.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | FR20110058740 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1158740 | [2013/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574563 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/40, B29C45/37, B29L31/00, A47G7/08 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
A47G7/08 (EP);
B29C45/372 (EP);
B29L2031/7004 (EP);
B29L2031/7136 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | B65D1/40, B29C45/37 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Moulded decorated container and mould for manufacturing same | [2013/14] | English: | Gespritzter Dekorbehälter und Spritzform für seine Herstellung | [2013/14] | French: | Contenant décoré obtenu par moulage et son moule de fabrication | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 03.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US6763962 (WANG CHIH HUNG [TW]) [X] 8-10 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 [Y] 11-14; | [Y]FR2161807 (CONLOR MOLDING SYSTEMS) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2011091670 (LI KUN-YI [TW]) [Y] 1-7,11-14 * the whole document * [A] 8-10; | [A]DE7227210U (SCHMALBACH LUBECA WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |