EP2582209 - Operating section in an electric installation system and electric installation system comprising at least one power element and at least one operating section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gira Giersiepen GmbH & Co. KG Dahlienstrasse 12 42477 Radevormwald / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Gira Giersiepen GmbH & Co. Kg Dahlienstrasse 12 42477 Radevormwald / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemmann, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. Im Spring 13 42555 Velbert / DE | 02 /
Nawrocki, Matthias Im Hawisch 4 41470 Neuss / DE | 03 /
Voigtländer, Andreas Alte Wache 12 58509 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Tönhardt, Marion Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12006964.6 | 08.10.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE20111054357 | 10.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011054357 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2582209 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2582209 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/175, H05B47/19, G06F3/01, G06F3/0354, G06F21/88, H03K17/96, H04L12/28, G05B19/042, // G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F21/88 (EP);
G06F3/03547 (EP);
H03K17/962 (EP);
H04L12/2803 (EP);
H05B47/175 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bedienteil in einem elektrischen Installationssystem sowie elektrisches Installationssystem, das mindestens ein Leistungsteil und mindestens ein Bedienteil umfasst | [2021/16] | English: | Operating section in an electric installation system and electric installation system comprising at least one power element and at least one operating section | [2013/16] | French: | Élément de commande dans un système d'installation électrique ainsi que système d'installation électrique comprenant au moins un élément de puissance et au moins un élément de commande | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/16] | Bedienteil in einem elektrischen Istallationssystem sowie elektrisches Installationssystem, das mindestens ein Leistungsteil und mindestens ein Bedienteil umfasst | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102009006260 (DENSO INT AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]US2010127847 (EVANS DAVE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0029]; figure 2B *; | [X]US2006155429 (BOONE DAVID D [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19845960 | DE9321350U |