EP2599717 - Rotor blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi, Laurent 68 boulevard Général Nollet 13012 Marseille / FR | 02 /
Isidore, Nicolas 15 rue du Vallon de la Vierge 13290 Les Milles / FR | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330 Rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12007642.7 | 12.11.2012 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | FR20110003664 | 01.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1103664 | [2013/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599717 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599717 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/48, B64C11/26 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B64C11/26 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (US);
B64C27/473 (EP,US);
B64C27/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | Rotorblatt | [2013/23] | English: | Rotor blade | [2013/23] | French: | Pale de rotor | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2012 | AL | 19.03.2014 | AT | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | RS | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | IE | 12.11.2014 | LU | 12.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.11.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3923422 (IANNIELLO DANIEL JOHN, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1427158 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP) [A] 1-12 * page 8, lines 20-85; figures 19-21 *; | [A]US4302155 (GRIMES RICHARD V, et al) [A] 1-12* column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 30; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3923422 | GB1427158 | US4302155 | WO9308017 |