EP2607865 - Device and method for measuring the tank fill level in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Ottostrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalo, Medina-Sanchez Manderscheider Strasse 12 50937 Köln / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 12007760.7 | 16.11.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | DE201110122127 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011122127 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607865 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2607865 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/296, G01F23/22, G01F23/30 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G01F23/2962 (EP,US);
G01F23/22 (US);
G01F23/30 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | G01F23/296 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2013/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Tankfüllstandserfassung in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2013/26] | English: | Device and method for measuring the tank fill level in a motor vehicle | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à déterminer le niveau de remplissage du réservoir d'un véhicule automobile | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 01.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9932857 (SIMMONDS PRECISION PRODUCTS [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1 - page 24 *; | [A]US2008103703 (TICHBORNE FRANKLIN GEORGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]EP2339136 (IVECO MOTORENFORSCHUNG AG [CH]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [X] - Peter Wallebäck, "Fuel Level Estimation for Heavy VehiclesUsing a Kalman Filter", (20081124), pages i - 51, Linköping University - Vehicular Systems Masters thesis, LiTH-ISY-EX-08/4184, URL: http://www.vehicular.isy.liu.se/Publications/MSc/08_EX_4184_PW.pdf, XP002733046 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * |