EP2602949 - Subsequent association identifier (AID) update within single user, multiple user, multiple access, and/or MIMO wireless communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2018/52] |
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Qi 300 Berry Street, Unit 1008 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007883.7 | 22.11.2012 | [2013/24] | Priority number, date | US201161567020P | 05.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161567020 P | US201213563064 | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US201213563064 | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2602949 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2602949 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2602949 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/24 (US);
H04B7/0413 (KR,US);
H04L1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0033 (US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0618 (KR);
H04L1/0625 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0668 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2013/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Nachfolgender Zusammenhangsidentifikator (AID)-Aktualisierung mit Einzelbenutzer-, Mehrfachbenutzer-, Mehrfachzugang, und/oder MIMO-Kommunikationen | [2013/24] | English: | Subsequent association identifier (AID) update within single user, multiple user, multiple access, and/or MIMO wireless communications | [2013/24] | French: | Mise à jour d'identifiant d'association successive dans des communications à utilisateur unique, plusieurs utilisateurs, à accès multiples et/ou sans fil MIMO | [2013/24] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2012 | AL | 14.03.2018 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SI | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | GB | 22.11.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | LU | 22.11.2018 | MT | 22.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SI | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010265864 (HE YONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0009] ** figure 5 *; | [A]US2011064040 (KIM JOONSUK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0139] , [0140] * * figures 15,16,17 * |