EP2613059 - Device for controlling a fluid powered actuator of a working equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDAC Systems & Services GmbH Industriestraße 66280 Sulzbach / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Hydac System GmbH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huth, Heinz-Peter Am Wald 42 66802 Überherrn / DE | 02 /
Komma, Georg Am Leimbach 28 69234 Dielheim / DE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Bartels & Partner Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12007988.4 | 28.11.2012 | [2013/28] | Priority number, date | DE20121000045 | 03.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012000045 | [2013/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2613059 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2613059 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/00, F15B11/10, B60G17/00, B60D1/14, F16F9/00 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
F15B1/021 (EP);
B60G17/056 (EP);
F15B11/10 (EP);
B60G2300/08 (EP);
B60G2500/30 (EP);
F15B2211/30515 (EP);
F15B2211/3052 (EP);
F15B2211/3127 (EP);
F15B2211/50518 (EP);
F15B2211/50554 (EP);
F15B2211/5153 (EP);
F15B2211/625 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | F15B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ansteuerung eines fluidbetätigten Aktuators bei einer Arbeitsgerätschaft | [2013/28] | English: | Device for controlling a fluid powered actuator of a working equipment | [2013/28] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un actionneur actionné par un fluide pour un appareil de travail | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 11.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/37] | Appeal following examination | 06.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T1386/20 | 15.05.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102004040636 (HYDAC SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102010013126 (WEBER HYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1963118 (HYDAC SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * |