EP2607503 - Quenching chamber with an integral access door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen, Inc. 984 Ipsen Road Cherry Valley, IL 61016 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamid, Jake 80 Saint Lo Court Oakwood Hills, Illinois 60013 / US | 02 /
Moller, Craig A. 6194 Silver Hawk Court Roscoe, Illinois 61073 / US | 03 /
Grobler, Hendrik 211 2nd Street E Clyde Park, Montana 59018 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/41] |
Former [2013/26] | Kassner, Klaus Wickramstrasse 5 d 14089 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12008526.1 | 21.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US201161579058P | 22.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161579058 P | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607503 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607503 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/62, C21D1/64, C21D1/667, F27D1/18, F27D15/02 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C21D1/62 (EP,US);
F27D9/00 (EP,US);
C21D1/64 (EP,US);
C21D1/667 (EP,US);
F27D1/1858 (EP,US);
F27D15/02 (EP,US);
F27D15/0286 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Löschkammer mit integrierter Zugangstür | [2013/26] | English: | Quenching chamber with an integral access door | [2013/26] | French: | Chambre d'extinction avec porte d'accès intégrée | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2012 | AL | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | IE | 21.12.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GB | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GB | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GB | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GB | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GB | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | BE | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2379607 (VIDE & TRAITEMENT SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0798391 (ALD AICHELIN GESMBH [AT]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19909316 (LINDE TECH GASE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]CN1418971 (EPSON INTERNAT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007127357 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]CN101319272 (SHENYANG HENGJIN VACUUM TECHNO [CN]) [A] 1 * abstract * |