EP2474220 - Automatic header lateral tilt to ground speed response [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium nv Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2014/13] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3a 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schroeder, Jay D. 355 Schroeder Road Coal Valley, IL Illinois 61240 / US | 02 /
Bose, Leo G. 6936 Johnson Court Wind Lake, WI Wisconsin 53185 / US | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2015/35] |
Former [2012/28] | CNH IP Department Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 12150398.1 | 06.01.2012 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | US20110985416 | 06.01.2011 Original published format: US 985416 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474220 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474220 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/14 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
A01D41/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2012/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fahrgeschwindigkeitsabhängige automatische Vorsatzseitenneigung | [2012/28] | English: | Automatic header lateral tilt to ground speed response | [2012/28] | French: | Réponse automatique à la vitesse du sol de l'inclinaison latérale d'un plateau de coupe | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 26.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2012 | AL | 26.08.2015 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | IE | 06.01.2016 | LU | 06.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.01.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.01.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.01.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.01.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MT | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5704200 (CHMIELEWSKI JR THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-13,15,16 * figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,9,10, * * column 10, lines 21-32 * * column 11, lines 52-58 * * column 13, line 64 - column 14, line 1 * * column 28, lines 11-33 * * column 36, lines 16-29 * * column 37, lines 5-15 * * column 39, line 47 - column 40, line 27 * * column 58, lines 25-38 * [I] 4,14,17; | [Y]US6615569 (CARLZ RANDALL J [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9-13,15-17 * column 4, lines 5-15 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 42 *; | [Y]US4944141 (ORLANDO FRANKLIN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9-13,15-17 * abstract * * column 1, lines 13-38 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 65 * * column 6, lines 26-41 *; | [A]US2010287898 (RINGWALD JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0023] , [0024] , [0029] , [0034] - [0037] - [0039] * | by applicant | US5469694 |