EP2478967 - Valve for a spray gun, spray gun and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIWA WILHELM WAGNER GMBH & CO. KG Gewerbestrasse 1-3 D-35633 Lahnau / DE | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherer, Dirk Am Langenbruch 7 D-35633 Lahnau / DE | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | ||
Former [2012/30] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12151333.7 | 17.01.2012 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | DE20111002878 | 19.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011002878 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478967 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2478967 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/04, F16K11/076, F16K11/085, B05B7/12 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B05B7/0408 (EP,US);
B05B7/1263 (EP,US);
F16K11/076 (EP,US);
F16K11/0853 (EP,US);
B05B7/0483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2012/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Ventil für eine Spritzpistole, Spritzpistole und Verfahren | [2012/30] | English: | Valve for a spray gun, spray gun and method | [2012/30] | French: | Soupape pour un pistolet pulvérisateur, pistolet pulvérisateur et procédé | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2012 | AL | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.01.2012 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.01.2012 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20104036U (WAGNER WILHELM WIWA [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | US6471141 |