Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
31.08.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.03.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.02.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.11.2012 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.08.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |