Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
09.08.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.03.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.03.2017 | Change - representative | |
02.12.2016 | Publication of search report | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
02.12.2016 | Change - classification | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
05.02.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.07.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |