EP2480006 - Improved structure for amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TiinLab Audio Technology Ltd. 5F, No. 186, Sec. 2, Jhongsing Rd. Sindian Dist. New Taipei City / TW | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Cheng-Yuan TiinLab Audio Technology Ltd. 5F, No. 186, Sec. 2, Jhongsing Rd. Sindian District New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Tsai, Hong-Bing TiinLab Audio Technology Ltd. No. 1, Sec. 1, Shennong Rd., Yilan City Yilan County Yilan City / TW | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Wittmann, Günther Wittmann Hernandez Patent Attorneys Boschetsrieder Straße 67 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12151713.0 | 19.01.2012 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | TW20110101902 | 19.01.2011 Original published format: TW 100101902 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2480006 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2480006 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/26 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04R7/26 (EP,US);
H04R9/02 (KR);
H04R9/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H04R1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbesserte Struktur für einen Verstärker | [2012/30] | English: | Improved structure for amplifier | [2012/30] | French: | Structure améliorée pour amplificateur | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR100930537B (BLUECOM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,7-10,13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0028]; figures 3, 4 *; | [X]KR100963561B (BUMJIN I & D CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0023] - [0039]; figures 3-7 *; | [XY]JP2001028796 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0 20] - [0024] - [0 30] - [0032]; figures 1-3, 6 * [Y] 2,8-10,13; | [XA]US4722517 (DIJKSTRA KEES [NL], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 16; figures 1a, 1b * [A] 2-15; | [Y]US2008205688 (SATO EIJI [JP]) [Y] 2,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] - [0 62] - [0065] - [0 58]; figures 1C, 2 *; | [A]KR20100109636 (KIM SANG ROK [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008]; figure 1 * |