EP2450857 - Medical supply apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-38-5 Nishishimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8433 / JP | [2015/11] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Panasonic Healthcare Co., Ltd. 2131-1 Minamigata Toon-shi Ehime 791-0395 / JP | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sanyo Electric Biomedical Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishiwatari, Hitoshi 1685-35 Horiku-cho Taebayashi-shi Gunma 374-0033 / JP | 02 /
Uema, Shinya Izumiryo 5-114 57-1 Sumiyoshi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0521 / JP | 03 /
Haraguchi, Manabu 50-8 Hinode Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0525 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kouichi Parukumezon A 202 1277-10 Uchigashima-cho Ota-shi Gunma 373-0813 / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Shigeyuki 1-8-24 Shironouchi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0518 / JP | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12152079.5 | 20.02.2003 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | JP20020042598 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042598 | JP20020042626 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042626 | JP20020042649 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042649 | JP20020042653 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042653 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2450857 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2450857 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/62, G07F11/64, B65B5/10, B65B61/26 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B65B5/103 (EP,US);
B65B1/30 (KR);
A61J3/00 (KR);
B65B57/00 (KR);
B65B61/26 (EP,KR,US);
G07F11/42 (EP,US);
G07F11/62 (EP,US);
G07F11/64 (EP,US);
G07F17/0092 (EP,US);
G07F9/026 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL, SE [2012/19] | Title | German: | Medizinische Abgabevorrichtung | [2012/19] | English: | Medical supply apparatus | [2012/19] | French: | Appareil d'administration médicale | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/47] | 17.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2016 | 19.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03703352.9 / EP1477403 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030703352) is 20.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5907493 (BOYER JOSEPH H [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000142602 (TAKAZONO SANGYO KK) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6152621 (LANGAN JOSEPH W [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPS575282Y |