EP2620689 - Adjustable supporting stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Ming-Hsien No.8, Ln. 403, Min-an Rd. Xinzhuang Dist. New Taipei City 24258 / TW | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Schwerbrock, Florian Hagenauer Strasse 1 10435 Berlin / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2013/31] | Schwerbrock, Florian Danziger Straße 35a 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12152431.8 | 25.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620689 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620689 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/18, F16M11/24 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
F16M11/046 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP);
F16M2200/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2013/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Stützstand | [2013/31] | English: | Adjustable supporting stand | [2013/31] | French: | Pied de support réglable | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2012 | AL | 15.07.2015 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | RS | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | GB | 25.01.2016 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | FR | 01.02.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.01.2012 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.01.2012 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.01.2012 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.01.2012 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
FR | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2416048 (HUANG MING-HSIEN [TW]) [E] 1-12 * claims 1-11 * * figures 1b,2b *; | [A]US2008210841 (TSENG LI-TIEN [TW]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0057]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2008099637 (PAI CHIH-TANG [TW]) [A] 1-12 * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0023] *; | [A]EP0183938 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 45 * |