EP2621055 - Electric machine and rotor for an electric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fick, Michael Leiten 1 97656 Sondernau / DE | 02 /
Vollmer, Rolf Espenlaubstraße 13 36129 Gersfeld / DE | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 12152790.7 | 27.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621055 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K41/03 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H02K41/031 (EP);
H02K1/2713 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine und Läufer für eine elektrische Maschine | [2013/31] | English: | Electric machine and rotor for an electric machine | [2013/31] | French: | Machine électrique et rotor pour une machine électrique | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 02.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP2224581 (IND MOTORI ELETTRICI S I M E L [IT]) [X] 1-6,8,9,14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 11-13 [I] 7,10; | [Y]EP1001507 (CONCEPTION & DEV MICHELIN SA [CH]) [Y] 11-13 * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]WO2004086595 (UNIV BERLIN TECH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US4700096 (EPARS MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |