EP2485356 - Energy storage and power management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arista Power, Inc. 1999 Mt. Read Boulevard Rochester, NY 14615 / US | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matthews, Mark 8 Chablis Drive Fairport, NY New York 14450 / US | 02 /
Nayar, Hari 50 Meadow Glen Fairport, NY New York 14450 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12152896.2 | 27.01.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | US201161438779P | 02.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161438779 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485356 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H02J3/008 (EP,US);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J2300/10 (EP);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US);
Y02E70/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Energiespeicher- und -verwaltungssystem | [2012/32] | English: | Energy storage and power management system | [2012/32] | French: | Stockage de l'énergie et système de gestion de l'alimentation | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003047209 (YANAI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9-11,13 * the whole document * [I] 5,8; | [XI]WO2008058284 (GRIDPOINT INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-15,17 * the whole document *[I] 8,16; | [XI]WO2009155445 (PREMIUM POWER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9,10,13 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XI]US2010327800 (REINECCIUS STACEY [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9-13 * the whole document * [I] 5,8 |