EP2620112 - Bone anchoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Josefstr. 5 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matthis, Wilfried Mühlenstr. 11 79367 Weisweil / DE | 02 /
Meer, Martin Birkenweg 7/1 72189 Vöhringen / DE | 03 /
Biedermann, Lutz Am Schäfersteig 8 78048 VS-Villingen / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/31] | 01 /
Matthia, Wilfried Mühlenstr. 11 79367 Weisweil / DE | ||
02 /
Meer, Martin Birkenweg 7/1 72189 Vöhringen / DE | |||
03 /
Biedermann, Lutz Am Schäfersteig 8 78048 VS-Villingen / DE | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12153154.5 | 30.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620112 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620112 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/7035 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/7037 (KR,US);
A61B17/7002 (KR,US);
A61B17/7032 (KR);
A61B17/7034 (KR,US);
A61B17/7049 (KR);
A61B17/7082 (KR);
A61B17/8605 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
F04C2270/041 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | Knochenverankerungsvorrichtung | [2013/31] | English: | Bone anchoring device | [2013/31] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage d'os | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14192707.9 / EP2837347 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 12.11.2014 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | RS | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | IE | 30.01.2015 | LU | 30.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MK | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RS | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 12.11.2014 | |
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US7604656 (SHLUZAS ALAN E [US]) [XD] 1-5,7,8,12,13 * figures 7,9,14-16,18 * * column 1, line 50 - line 67 * * column 7, line 34 - line 59 * * column 8, line 5 - column 44 * * column 15, line 33 - column 16, line 19 * * column 16, line 35 - line 58 * * column 17, line 7 - line 15 * * column 17, line 53 - column 14 * * column 19, line 46 - line 61 * * column 20, line 11 - line 24 * [I] 10,14; | [X]US2010191293 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0049] - [0051]; figures 1,8,9A,12 *; | [X]EP2371311 (BIEDERMANN MOTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0026] , [0029]; figures 1,7,10 *; | [E]WO2012064360 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [E] 1-5,7,8,12,13* paragraphs [0165] , [0167] - [0169] - [0171] , [0173]; figures 34-56 *; | [E]EP2455028 (BIEDERMANN TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0029] *; | [E]EP2468198 (BIEDERMANN TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0019]; figures 1,5A * | by applicant | US2007118123 | US7604656 |