EP2506635 - Computer readable storage medium, information communication device and link method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura Masatoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Miura, Yuichi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Ishioka, Eiji c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Hutchison, James Haseltine Lake LLP 300 High Holborn London, Greater London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12153235.2 | 31.01.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | JP20110081117 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011081117 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2506635 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2506635 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/14, H04N7/18, H04M1/725 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04W48/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/44 (KR);
H04W12/08 (KR);
H04W8/24 (KR);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | H04W48/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computerlesbares Speichermedium, Informationskommunikationsvorrichtung und Verbindungsverfahren | [2012/40] | English: | Computer readable storage medium, information communication device and link method | [2012/40] | French: | Support de stockage lisible sur ordinateur, dispositif de communication d'informations et procédé de liaison | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2016 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/24] | 24.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/24] | Appeal following examination | 21.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T1538/18 | 24.05.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.04.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1450515 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] *; | [I]US2008075247 (TANAKA ITSUMA [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 6,8 *; | [A] - Jadu Saikia, "Google talk camera icon meaning", (20090914), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://all-mixed.blogspot.nl/2009/09/google-talk-camera-icon-meaning.html, (20130219), XP055053891 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |