12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
13.05.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
04.12.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
16.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
09.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
20.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.08.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
19.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|