10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
03.03.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
30.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
25.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
11.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
11.12.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
11.12.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
04.12.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
04.12.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
04.12.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
28.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
11.02.2013 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |