Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2484440 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B1 | EP2484440 | 08.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20110043 | 02.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1403545 | 31.10.2013 | B1 | ITBO20110043 | 03.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITBO20110043 | 02.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201600237B | 31.08.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | ITBO20110043 | 02.02.2011 |