EP2495013 - Assembly for searching for an optimal configuration of a bi-, tri- or multi-ventricular cardiac resynchronisation implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorin CRM SAS Parc d'Affaires NOVEOS 4, Avenue Réaumur 92140 Clamart Cedex / FR | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renesto, Fabrizio Via Pozzo, 48 10013 Borgofranco d'Ivrea (TO) / IT | 02 /
Giorgis, Lionel 123 Boulevard Hoche 22000 Saint Brieuc / FR | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12153639.5 | 02.02.2012 | [2012/36] | Priority number, date | FR20110051729 | 03.03.2011 Original published format: FR 1151729 | [2012/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495013 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2495013 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
A61N1/36578 (EP,US);
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/36843 (EP,US);
A61N1/3686 (EP,US);
A61N1/3682 (EP,US);
A61N1/3706 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | Anordnung für die Suche nach einer optimalen Konfiguration eines Implantats zur bi-, tri- oder multiventrikulären Resynchronisation des Herzens | [2012/36] | English: | Assembly for searching for an optimal configuration of a bi-, tri- or multi-ventricular cardiac resynchronisation implant | [2012/36] | French: | Ensemble pour la recherche d'une configuration optimale d'un implant de resynchronisation cardiaque bi-, tri- ou multiventriculaire | [2012/36] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2012 | AL | 24.07.2013 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MK | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | RS | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | SM | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.10.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | IE | 02.02.2014 | LU | 02.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MK | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
RS | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
SM | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
IE | 02.02.2014 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 24.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006049538 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1736203 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 ** paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | EP0515319 | EP1108446 | WO2006049538 | EP1736203 | EP1938861 | EP2082684 | EP2092885 |