EP2484212 - Automatic kiln setter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hecht, Jean-Louis 1, rue de Metz 57470 Hombourg-Haut / FR | For all designated states Hecht, Jean-Claude Monte Vale Canico Cabeca de Cabra 7520-409 Porto Covo- Sines / PT | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Vièl, Frédérique Cabinet Vièl 9, rue des Jardins 57520 Grosbliederstroff / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Vièl, Frédérique Cabinet Vièl 9, rue des Jardins 57520 Grosbliederstroff / FR | Application number, filing date | 12153681.7 | 02.02.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | FR20110050907 | 04.02.2011 Original published format: FR 1150907 | [2012/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484212 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/07 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A21B3/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatischer Ofenbeschicker | [2012/32] | English: | Automatic kiln setter | [2012/32] | French: | Enfourneur automatique | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1820400 (MIWE MICHAEL WENZ GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,5-8,10-14 * figures 1,3; claim 1 * [Y] 2-4,9; | [A]DE102009026620 (WEISS VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [Y]DE7601938U (RÄUCHLE UND BAUSCH KG) [Y] 2-4 * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1107199 (TOP VENDING SRL [IT]) [Y] 9 * figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2614714 | EP0368699 | FR2821524 | EP0708421 | US6065390 | EP0337836 | EP1820400 |