Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
24.05.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.10.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |