EP2506332 - Substrate for improved handling and protection of an optoelectronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moser Baer India Ltd. 43B Okhla Industrial Estate, Phase 3 New Dehli 110020 / IN | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsman, Herman G. Moser Baer India Ltd. 43B, Okhla Industrial Estate, Phase 3 110020 New Dehli / IN | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12153895.3 | 03.02.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | INEL09092011D | 31.03.2011 Original published format: IND EL09092011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506332 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/52 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
H10K50/858 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Substrat zur verbesserten Handhabung und Sicherung einer optoelektronischen Vorrichtung | [2012/40] | English: | Substrate for improved handling and protection of an optoelectronic device | [2012/40] | French: | Substrat pour gestion améliorée et protection d'un dispositif optoélectronique | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002260845 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0040]; figure 1; example 1 *; | [X]EP1589584 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0041] , [0054] - [0056]; figure 13 *; | [X]KR20100025210 (NAMOTEK CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,4* paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2010205511 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3-8,10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0030] - [0033] - [0036] - [0042]; figure 5 * |