EP2533377 - Electric safety plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berker GmbH & Co. KG Klagebach 38 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klauer, Wilfried Berker GmbH & Co. KG, TB Lothringer Str. 28 58091 Hagen / DE | 02 /
Trantow, Cordula Berker GmbH & Co. KG Luisental 24 58509 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Laurent Laurent Nuss Conseil 12, rue Theophile Schuler 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12153971.2 | 06.02.2012 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | DE20111050845 | 06.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011050845 | [2012/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533377 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/655, H01R103/00, H01R24/78 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H01R24/78 (EP);
H01R13/655 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Schutzkontaktsteckdose | [2012/50] | English: | Electric safety plug | [2012/50] | French: | Prise électrique à contact protégé | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 14.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1489703 (ENSTO BUSCH JAEGER OY [FI]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0011]; figure 19 *; | [Y]DE8303884U (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29823573U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 17; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102008023938 |