EP2484553 - Vehicle lamp and optical unit thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 8-3, Takanawa 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8711 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Akinori c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki, Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/27] |
Former [2012/32] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12154292.2 | 07.02.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | JP20110023861 | 07.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011023861 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484553 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484553 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484553 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, B60Q1/18, F21V7/00, F21S41/147, F21S41/32 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0041 (EP,US);
F21S41/147 (EP,US);
F21S41/323 (EP);
F21S45/47 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | B60Q1/00, F21S8/10, B60Q1/18, F21V7/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/32] | B60Q1/00, F21S8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuglampe und optische Einheit dafür | [2012/32] | English: | Vehicle lamp and optical unit thereof | [2012/32] | French: | Phare de véhicule et son unité optique | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 31.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2012 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 05.11.2018 | GB | 07.02.2019 | IE | 07.02.2019 | LU | 07.02.2019 | MT | 07.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.02.2012 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
MT | 07.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
MT | 07.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
MT | 07.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
GB | 07.02.2019 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1276157 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [I]EP1338468 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [I] 1-7 * figures 1-22; claims 1,2,8 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] - [0038] - [0043] - [0077] , [0078] *; | [A]EP1388707 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0022]; figures 1,5 *; | [XI]EP1970617 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0028] - [0035] - [0 59] * [I] 2,5,6; | [A]US2008247170 (PECK JOHN P [US]) [A] 1-4,7 * paragraph [0009]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2028411 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0035]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2009296383 (VALSTER ADRIAAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]DE102008034376 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 5,6 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2008226706 | JP2008226707 |