EP2484590 - Airflow control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schroder, Bruce R. 4 Colonial Avenue Agawam, MA 01001 / US | 02 /
Ernst, Jeffrey 93 Chamberlain Road Wethersfield, CT 06109 / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2012/32] | 01 /
Schroder, Bruce R. 4 Colonial Avenue Agawam, MA Massachusetts 01001 / US | ||
02 /
Ernst, Jeffrey 93 Chamberlain Road Wethersfield, CT Connecticut 06109 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Lees, Gregory Alexander Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2012/32] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12154356.5 | 07.02.2012 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | US201113022999 | 08.02.2011 Original published format: US201113022999 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2484590 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2484590 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484590 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/00, F01D17/26, F01D17/24 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
F01D17/24 (EP,US);
F01D17/26 (EP,US);
G05D7/005 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0396 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2278 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | B64D13/06, G05D16/16, F01D17/24, F01D17/26 | ||
Former IPC [2012/32] | B64D13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2012/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Luftstromsteuerungssystem | [2012/32] | English: | Airflow control system | [2012/32] | French: | Système de contrôle du débit d'air | [2012/32] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2012 | AL | 04.04.2018 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | RS | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.02.2012 | |
AL | 04.04.2018 | ||
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RS | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1873430 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2006102232 (PLEVICH CHUCK W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 25]; figure 2a *; | [X]US5230362 (GOODMAN ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 *; | [X]US3769998 (AVANT W) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 15-45; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003145603 (REED WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0031]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003192595 (BENSON DWAYNE M [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017]; figure 1 * |