EP2487123 - System with order picking station including at least one stack for vertical accumulation and sequenced distribution of containers. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/33] | Order picking station including at least one stack for vertical accumulation and sequenced distribution of containers. | ||
[2013/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVOYE 18 Boulevard des Gorgets 21000 Dijon / FR | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collin, Jean-Michel 19 rue Louis Courtot de Cissey 21190 MERCEUIL / FR | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Guéné, Patrick Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12154797.0 | 09.02.2012 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | FR20110051153 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: FR 1151153 | [2012/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487123 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487123 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/127, B65G1/137 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
B65G1/0485 (EP,US);
B65G1/04 (US);
B65G1/127 (EP,US);
B65G1/1378 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit einer Vorbereitungsstelle für Aufträge, die mindestens ein Rohr zur vertikalen Speicherung und zur folgegesteuerten Ausgabe von Inhalten umfasst | [2013/39] | English: | System with order picking station including at least one stack for vertical accumulation and sequenced distribution of containers. | [2013/39] | French: | Ensemble comprenant un poste de préparation de commandes avec au moins une cheminée d'accumulation verticale et de distribution séquencée de contenants. | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/33] | Vorbereitungsstelle für Aufträge, die mindestens ein Rohr zur vertikalen Speicherung und zur folgegesteuerten Ausgabe von Inhalten umfasst | ||
Former [2012/33] | Order picking station including at least one stack for vertical accumulation and sequenced distribution of containers. | ||
Former [2012/33] | Poste de préparation de commandes comprenant au moins une cheminée d'accumulation verticale et de distribution séquencée de contenants. | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2012 | AL | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | IE | 09.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.02.2012 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.02.2012 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS552808U (-) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPS5781004 (DAIFUKU MACHINERY WORKS) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US4909697 (BERNARD II CLAY [US], et al) [A] 1 * columns 1-8; figures 1-11 *; | [XYI]CH678940 (FRITSCHI AG HUGO) [X] 1-4,10,11,15,19 * columns 1-7; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,9,14 [I] 6-8,12,13,16-18; | [Y]JPH04116001 (ITOKI KOSAKUSHO) [Y] 14 * abstract *; | [A]US5529165 (SHUPERT PAUL T [US]) [A] 1 * columns 1-12; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US5595263 (PIGNATARO ANTHONY [AU]) [Y] 9 * columns 1-10; figures 1-9 *; | [A]JP2001088908 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE10225332 (WAGNER RUDOLF M [DE], et al) [A] 9 * pages 1-8; figures 1-3 * |