12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
05.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
01.08.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
26.07.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.07.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.07.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - English title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
22.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
15.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |