EP2626237 - Motor vehicle with a seating bench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Steyr Fahrzeugtechnik AG & Co KG Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschaber, Christoph Grieskai 42/7/27 8020 Graz / AT | 02 /
Auer, Thomas Klachl 3 9363 Metnitz / AT | 03 /
Erlacher, Manuel Nockweg 6 9545 Radenthein / AT | 04 /
Rodler, Martin Krottendorfer Hauptstrasse 16A/5 8160 Krottendorf / AT | 05 /
Zachnegger, Harald Am Mühlgraben 62 8041 Graz / AT | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Zangger, Bernd, et al Magna International Europe GmbH Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2019/14] |
Former [2013/33] | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International Europe AG Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 VG-Nord 8041 Graz / AT | Application number, filing date | 12154891.1 | 10.02.2012 | [2013/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626237 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2626237 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/30, B60N2/32, B60R21/02 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
B60N2/3031 (EP,US);
B60N2/24 (KR);
B60N2/02 (US);
B60N2/00 (US);
B60N2/3027 (US);
B60N2/3065 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2013/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Sitzbank | [2013/33] | English: | Motor vehicle with a seating bench | [2013/33] | French: | Véhicule automobile doté d'un banc | [2013/33] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2012 | AL | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.02.2012 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102010005368 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,16 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0012] , [0029] * * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [I] 6,7,10,12-15,17-20; | [XAI]US2011156424 (ORIHASHI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13,16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0068] - [0070] - [0104] - [0109] - [0111] - [0114] * * abstract * * figures 1-5,9-10,19-24 * [A] 7 [I] 6,14,15,18-20; | [XAI]DE19628699 (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13,16 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 48 * * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [A] 7 [I] 3,13,14,18-20; | [XAI]FR2923188 (PRODUCTIONS S A SA B V [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 24 * * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7 [I] 12,13,16,19; | [XAI]DE19811886 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,10-13,16,17 * column 3, lines 53-68 * * abstract * * figures 1-4 * [A] 7,9 [I] 6; | [XAI]FR1024572 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10-12 * column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 3, paragraph 6 - column 3, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 9 [I] 3,5,14,15,17; | [IA]US3703310 (LYSTAD LEONARD A) [I] 1-5,8,10,12-20 * column 1, lines 26-58 * * column 4, lines 35-56 * * column 5, lines 38-42 * * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6,7,9,11 | Examination | WO9962739 | FR2918935 |