EP2469515 - Optical head and information recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takazawa, Koji Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Morita, Seiji Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Ootera, Yasuaki Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Ando, Hideo Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Morishita, Naoki Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
Umezawa, Kazuyo Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12155018.0 | 28.07.2006 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | JP20050222036 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005222036 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2469515 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2469515 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/24035 (EP,US);
G11B7/24094 (EP,US);
G11B7/24097 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24705 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24905 (EP,US);
G11B7/0053 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/24076 (EP,US);
G11B7/24079 (EP,US);
G11B7/24082 (EP,US);
G11B7/246 (EP,US);
G11B7/266 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/26] | Title | German: | Optischer Kopf und Informationsaufzeichnungs-/Informationswiedergabevorrichtung | [2012/26] | English: | Optical head and information recording/reproducing apparatus | [2012/26] | French: | Tête optique et appareil d'enregistrement/de reproduction d'informations | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06118067.5 / EP1748431 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060118067) is 07.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004085877 (LEE KYUNG-GEUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1530209 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005099916 (JEON IK B [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005105459 (TAMURA REIJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1548714 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1748436 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-5* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2621459B | JP3308954B |