EP2490464 - Methods and apparatus for utility meters or other devices with communications prioritiziation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ree, Bradley Richard 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339-8402 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12155225.1 | 13.02.2012 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | US201113028142 | 15.02.2011 Original published format: US201113028142 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2490464 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2490464 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04L12/28 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
Y04S40/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Verbrauchszähler oder andere Vorrichtungen mit Kommunikationspriorisierung | [2012/34] | English: | Methods and apparatus for utility meters or other devices with communications prioritiziation | [2012/34] | French: | Procédés et appareil pour compteurs utilitaires ou autres dispositifs avec priorisation de communication | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006145834 (BERKMAN WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 6] , [0 17] , [0 20] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 23] , [0 25] , [0 27] , [0028] , [0030] , [0 31] , [0 33] , [0 34]; claims 1-36 ** figures 1-5 * |