EP2458818 - Method for host selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [2020/19] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway San Mateo, California 94404 / US | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 919 East Hillside Boulevard 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy, Ronald J c/o Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. Second Floor Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 02 /
Jacob, Mark L. c/o Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. Second Floor Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/22] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12155710.2 | 17.09.2009 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | US20080235409 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: US 235409 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458818 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458818 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/12 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
H04L67/104 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/256 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1023 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1051 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1093 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hostauswahl | [2012/22] | English: | Method for host selection | [2012/22] | French: | Procédé de sélection d'hôtes | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09252219.2 / EP2166729 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090252219) is 17.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2009 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 17.09.2020 | LU | 17.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.09.2009 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7016942 (ODOM GARY [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-36 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]US2006209822 (HAMAMOTO MOE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0037] - [0044] *; | [I]US2006218624 (RAVIKUMAR SIVAKUMAR [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1, 2d-2g, 5, 6, 22-24 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0050] - [0 58] - [0067] - [0 73] - [0080] - [ 127] - [0142] *; | [A] - JIM DOWLING ET AL, "Improving ICE Service Selection in a P2P System using the Gradient Topology", SELF-ADAPTIVE AND SELF-ORGANIZING SYSTEMS, 2007. SASO '07. FIRST INTER NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-0-7695-2906-6, pages 285 - 288, XP031117905 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - page 2, column R, paragraph 1; figures 1a,1b * | [A] - ARNO WACKER ET AL, "A NAT Traversal Mechanism for Peer-To-Peer Networks", PEER-TO-PEER COMPUTING , 2008. P2P '08. EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080908), ISBN 978-0-7695-3318-6, pages 81 - 83, XP031322323 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - page 2, column R, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US2007076729 | US2009094370 |