EP2492095 - Method of manufacturing liquid jet head, liquid jet head, and liquid jet apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SII Printek Inc 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koseki, Osamu c/o SII Printek Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12156017.1 | 17.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110037346 | 23.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011037346 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492095 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492095 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
B41J2/1609 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/14209 (EP,US);
B41J2/16 (KR);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/1643 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flüssigkeitsstrahlkopfs, Flüssigkeitsstrahlkopf und Flüssigkeitsstrahlvorrichtung | [2012/35] | English: | Method of manufacturing liquid jet head, liquid jet head, and liquid jet apparatus | [2012/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de tête à jet liquide, tête à jet liquide et appareil à jet liquide | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 27.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 26.03.2014 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | RS | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MK | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AT | 26.03.2014 | ||
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5631680 (SUGAHARA HIROTO [JP]); | [XI]JP2001096743 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [Y]US6722035 (YOSHIMURA MANABU [JP]) | by applicant | JP2000168094 |