Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2460513 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2008328764 EP07121665 EP08855104 EP12156072 EP2008066339W JP2010535378 JP2014021388 KR20107014206 US78688510



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8404220Global Dossier 26.03.2013B2
US2010280121 04.11.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US78688510 25.05.2010
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5526035BGlobal Dossier 18.06.2014B2
JP2011504912 17.02.2011A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2224906Global Dossier 19.02.2014B1
EP2224906 08.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
EP08855104 27.11.2008
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2065032Global Dossier 03.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008328764BGlobal Dossier 21.11.2013B2
AU2008328764 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2460513Global Dossier 21.07.2021B1
EP2460513 06.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
EP08855104 27.11.2008
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0819026 25.05.2021B8
BRPI0819026 05.05.2020B1
BRPI0819026 04.04.2017A2
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2706379 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101878022B 19.02.2014B
CN101878022 03.11.2010A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103830163B 07.12.2016B
CN103830163 04.06.2014A
Priority number Date
CN200880117947 27.11.2008
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2464455T 02.06.2014T3
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2010005432 02.06.2010A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2476203 27.02.2013C2
RU2010126103 10.01.2012A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
WO2008EP66339 27.11.2008
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009068610Global Dossier 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101563379BGlobal Dossier 26.10.2015B1
KR20100098539 07.09.2010A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2014101373Global Dossier 05.06.2014A
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR071737 14.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2887225T 22.12.2021T3
Priority number Date
EP07121665 27.11.2007
US99661807 27.11.2007
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2224906