EP2463644 - Optical instrument including excitation source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boege, Steven, J. 329 Landfair Avenue San Mateo CA 94403 / US | 02 /
King, Howard, G. 1610 Beverly Place Berkeley CA 94707 / US | 03 /
Young, Eugene, F. 4061 Tritt Homestead Drive Marietta GA 30062 / US | 04 /
Sluis, Johannes, Paul 221 Bridgeport Drive Half Moon Bay CA 94019 / US | 05 /
Oldham, Mark, F. 16500 Soda Springs Road Los Gatos CA 95033 / US | [2013/26] |
Former [2012/24] | 01 /
Boege, Steven, J. 329 Landfair Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | ||
02 /
King, Howard, G. 1610 Beverly Place Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | |||
03 /
Young, Eugene, F. 4061 Tritt Homestead Drive Marietta, GA 30062 / US | |||
04 /
Sluis, Johannes, Paul 221 Bridgeport Drive Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | |||
05 /
Oldham, Mark, F. 16500 Soda Springs Road Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | Representative(s) | Wöhler, Christian Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Wöhler, Christian Life Technologies IP Legal Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 12156268.0 | 19.05.2003 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20020381671P | 17.05.2002 Original published format: US 381671 P | US20020409152P | 09.09.2002 Original published format: US 409152 P | US20030450734P | 28.02.2003 Original published format: US 450734 P | US20020216620 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: US 216620 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463644 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463644 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
G01N21/6452 (EP);
G01N2021/6419 (EP);
G01N2021/6463 (EP);
G01N2021/6478 (EP);
G01N2201/0627 (EP);
G01N2201/0628 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Optisches Instrument mit Anregungsquelle | [2012/24] | English: | Optical instrument including excitation source | [2012/24] | French: | Instrument optique comprenant une source d'excitation | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 28.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03753099.5 / EP1511990 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030753099) is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2003 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | IE | 19.05.2014 | LU | 19.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2003 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0058715 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9,10,15,16 * page 1, lines 20-23; figure 4 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 15 * * figure 4 * [Y] 7,8,11,13,17 [I] 6; | [Y]EP1124128 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-6,9,10,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 5] , [0 52] - [0058] - [ 109] - [0117] * * figures 9, 10, 22 *; | [Y]WO0135079 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10,12,14-16 * page 12, lines 26-28 *; | [Y]WO9960381 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,11,13,17 * page 7, lines 9-12 * * page 9, lines 6-16 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO0135079 | WO9960381 | US6207229 | US6251303 | US6306310 | US6319426 | US6322901 | US6326144 | US6426513 | US6444143 | US5990479 | US6207392 | US6423551 | US6468808 | US6274323 | US6331438 | US4356429 | US5554450 | US5593788 | US5863502 | US6529275 | US6256148 | WO0169211 | - HEBNER ET AL., "Local Tuning of Organic Light-Emitting Diode Color by Dye Droplet Application", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19980928), vol. 73, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1063/1.122278, XP000784155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.122278 |