EP2631298 - Biotechnological method for producing butanol and butyric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Industries AG Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Evonik Industries AG Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiemann, Yvonne Möllhoven 86F 45357 Essen / DE | 02 /
Reinecke, Liv Heidehang 9 45134 Essen / DE | 03 /
Haas, Thomas Backenkamp 9 48161 Münster / DE | 04 /
Weuster-Botz, Dirk Leonrodstr. 12 80634 München / DE | 05 /
Krispin, Harald Arcisstr. 62 80799 München / DE | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 12156493.4 | 22.02.2012 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631298 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/16, C12P7/52 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C12P7/16 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C12P7/52 (CN,RU,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | C12P7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Biotechnologisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von Butanol und Buttersäure | [2013/35] | English: | Biotechnological method for producing butanol and butyric acid | [2013/35] | French: | Procédé biotechnologique de production de butanol et d'acide butyrique | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/35] | Procédé biotechnologique et procédé de production de butanol et d'acide butyrique | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 31.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 08.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEN ET AL, "Acetate enhances solvent production and prevents degeneration in Clostridium beijerinckii BA101", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 52, pages 170 - 173, XP002678047 [A] 1-17 * See page 170 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530051504 | [A] - JANG ET AL, "Butanol production from renewable biomass: Rediscovery of metabolic pathways and metabolic engineering", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (201202), vol. 7, pages 186 - 198, XP002678028 [A] 1-17 * See pages 193-194 (Section 3.4); online publication in 2011 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201100059 | [A] - SCHMIDT ET AL, "Reaction engineering studies of acetone-butanol-ethanol fermentation with Clostridium acetobutylicum", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20111228), vol. 7, pages 656 - 661, XP002678029 [A] 1-17 * See page 656 (Abstract); online publication * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIOT.201100418 | by applicant | WO0068407 | WO03014330 | WO03040373 | - WIERINGA, K. T., J. MICROBIOL. SEROL., (1936), vol. 3, pages 263 - 273 | - BALCH, W. E.; SCHOBERT, S.; TANNER, R. S.; WOLFE, R. S., INT. J. SYS. BACTERIOL., (1977), vol. 27, pages 335 - 361 | - FONTAINE, F. E; PETERSON, W. H.; MCCOY, E.; JOHNSON, M. J., J. BACT., (1942), vol. 43, pages 701 - 715 | - ARIBINI ET AL., ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 161, pages 345 - 351 | - SAKAI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, vol. 29, pages 1697 - 1612 | - SVETLICHNY ET AL., SYSTEMATIC AND APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 14, pages 254 - 260 | - DIEKERT; WOHLFAHRT, ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1994), vol. 66, no. 1-3, pages 209 - 221 | - RICHTER, C. D. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 5, pages 3094 - 3100 | - HURST, K. M.; LEWIS, R., BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL 2010, (2010), vol. 48, pages 159 - 165 | - DWORKIN ET AL., The Prokaryotes - A Handbook on the Biology of Bacteria, (2006), vol. 2 | - HURST, K. M.; LEWIS, R., BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 48, pages 159 - 165 |