EP2631513 - Seal body, apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witcher, Bryan A. 2901 East Lake Road Erie, PA Pennsylvania 16506 / US | 02 /
Vallejo, Carlos A. 2901 East Lake Road Erie, PA Pennsylvania 16506 / US | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 12156501.4 | 22.02.2012 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631513 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631513 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/447 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
F16J15/4476 (EP);
F16J15/3204 (EP);
F16J15/4478 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2013/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Dichtkörper, Vorrichtung und Verfahren | [2013/35] | English: | Seal body, apparatus and method | [2013/35] | French: | Corps de joint, appareil et procédé | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2012 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | IS | 20.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.04.2016 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]NL1008191C (CONVEYOR COMPONENTS BV [NL]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]GB960565 (VLADIMIR OLIMPIEVICH ISAKOV, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-15 |