EP2543650 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-DENSITY FIBER REINFORCED CERAMIC COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/02] | Method for manufacturing high-density fiber reinforced ceramic composite materials | ||
[2016/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-343 / KR | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Energy Research 71-2, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, In-Sub 230-1, Jangdae-ri, Chubu-myeon Geumsan-gun 312-942 Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Se-Young 601-804, Mokryeon Maeul Apt., Yatap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-947 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Woo, Sang-Kuk 202-702, Banseok Maeul Apt., Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu 305-772 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
Seo, Doo-Won 102-104, Daelim Dure Apt., Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu 305-720 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
Bai, Kang 207-2302, Risencheu Apt., 22, Jamsil-dong Songpa-gu 138-220 Seoul / KR | 06 /
Yu, Ji-Haeng 102-1404, Sumokto Apt., Doan-dong, Seo-gu 302-318 Daejeon / KR | 07 /
Kim, Sun-Dong 703-2104, Banseok Maeul Apt., 612, Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu 305-750 Daejeon / KR | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/44] |
Former [2013/02] | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe Zimmermann Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 12156920.6 | 24.02.2012 | [2013/02] | Priority number, date | KR20110067251 | 07.07.2011 Original published format: KR 20110067251 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543650 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2543650 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B35/571, C04B35/628, C04B35/573, B82Y30/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/52 (KR);
C04B35/573 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/62863 (EP,US);
C04B35/62873 (EP,US);
C04B35/62894 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/483 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/614 (EP,US);
C04B2235/616 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249928 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | C04B35/571, C04B35/628 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHDICHTER, FASERVERSTÄRKTER KERAMIKVERBUNDSTOFFMATERIALIEN | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH-DENSITY FIBER REINFORCED CERAMIC COMPOSITE MATERIALS | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES CÉRAMIQUES À HAUTE DENSITÉ RENFORCÉS PAR DES FIBRES | [2016/23] |
Former [2013/02] | Verfahren zur Herstellung hochdichter, faserverstärkter Keramikverbundstoffmaterialien | ||
Former [2013/02] | Method for manufacturing high-density fiber reinforced ceramic composite materials | ||
Former [2013/02] | Procédé de fabrication de matériaux composites céramiques renforcés par fibres haute densité | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 26.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2012 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | GB | 24.02.2017 | IE | 24.02.2017 | LU | 24.02.2017 | MT | 24.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
MT | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
GB | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
LU | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5962103 (LUTHRA KRISHAN LAL [US], et al) [X] 12 * column 3, line 30 - line 62 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 25 * * claim 12 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]DE19815308 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11; | [XA]DE19815309 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11; | [XA]EP1084997 (SGL TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0051] - [0068] - [0071] * [A] 1-11 | Examination | JP2009227565 | US5273941 |