EP2492584 - Lighting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Izuru c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Daigo c/o Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12157079.0 | 27.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | JP20110042630 | 28.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011042630 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2492584 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2492584 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492584 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, H01L33/50, F21K99/00, F21V3/00, // F21Y101/02, F21Y111/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
F21V7/00 (EP,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21V3/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/30 (EP,US);
F21Y2107/40 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | F21V7/00, H01L33/50, F21K99/00, // F21Y101/02, F21Y111/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2012/35] | English: | Lighting apparatus | [2012/35] | French: | Appareil d'éclairage | [2012/35] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 03.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2012 | AL | 02.09.2015 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | RS | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | IE | 27.02.2016 | LU | 27.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 27.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR100883344B (KIM HYUN MIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12 * figures 2,3 * [I] 3,6,8-11,13-18; | [P]US2011156584 (KIM HYUN MIN [KR]) [P] * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0082] *; | [XI]WO2008050783 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12 * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 17 * * figures 1A, 1B * [I] 3,6,8-11,13-18; | [A]US2009161381 (WU TSU YAO [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]CN101793362 (KENNEDE ELECTRIONICS MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 4 * |