EP2518397 - Vehicle headlamp with a basic module and a spot module for creating a high beam light distribution and corresponding headlamp system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | Light module of a motor vehicle for creating a spot distribution of a high beam light distribution and motor vehicle headlamp with such a module | ||
[2019/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamm, Michael Augenriedstrasse 95 72800 Eningen u.A. / DE | 02 /
Rosenhahn, Ernst-Olaf Kirchstrasse 29 72411 Bodelshausen / DE | 03 /
Stefanov, Emil P. c/o Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12157213.5 | 28.02.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | DE20111017630 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011017630 | DE20111077636 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077636 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2518397 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2518397 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518397 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F21S41/663, F21S41/24, F21S41/143, B60Q1/14 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1423 (EP,US);
F21S41/143 (EP,US);
F21S41/151 (EP,US);
F21S41/24 (EP,US);
F21S41/663 (EP,US);
G02B6/0008 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/056 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | F21V14/00, F21S8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KFZ-Scheinwerfer mit einem Grundlichtmodul und einem Spotmodul zur Erzeugung einer Fernlicht-Lichtverteilung und dazugehörige Scheinwerferanlage | [2019/49] | English: | Vehicle headlamp with a basic module and a spot module for creating a high beam light distribution and corresponding headlamp system | [2019/49] | French: | Phare de véhicule avec un module de base et un module spot pour produire un faisceau de route et système de phare correspondant | [2019/49] |
Former [2012/44] | Lichtmodul eines Kraftfahrzeugs zur Erzeugung einer Spotverteilung einer Fernlicht-Lichtverteilung und Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer mit einem solchen Modul | ||
Former [2012/44] | Light module of a motor vehicle for creating a spot distribution of a high beam light distribution and motor vehicle headlamp with such a module | ||
Former [2012/44] | Module d'éclairage d'un véhicule automobile destiné à la production d'une répartition de point d'une répartition de lumière de phare et phare de véhicule automobile doté d'un tel module | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2012 | AL | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008316759 (VALCAMP DAVID J [CA], et al); | [A]EP2037167 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2068071 (VALEO VISION [FR]); | [A]DE102008036193 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]); | [AD]EP2280215 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]); | [XDI]DE102009053581 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]); | [A]EP2306074 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]); | [E]EP2517929 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]); | [E]WO2013020155 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT], et al); | [E]EP2587125 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) | Examination | DE102007008994 | EP2306075 | by applicant | DE10252228 | DE10204481 | DE10302969 | DE102005017528 | EP1640658 | DE102005012303 | DE102007033438 | DE102007049309 | DE102008044968 | EP2085264 | DE102008013603 | DE202010006097U | DE102009020619 | EP2280215 | DE102009053581 | DE20101026423 | DE20111017632 |