EP2492043 - Joint method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/35] | Joint device | ||
[2015/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Systems GmbH Blücherstraße 144 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henneke, Thomas Lexestraße 6 c 86971 Peiting / DE | 02 /
Mocker, Sebastian Jesuitengasse 23 86152 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Dobkowitz, Thomas Hans-Rollwagen-Straße 8 86157 Augsburg / DE | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Ernicke & Ernicke Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12157264.8 | 28.02.2012 | [2012/35] | Priority number, date | DE20112000456U | 28.02.2011 Original published format: DE 202011000456 U | [2012/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492043 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2492043 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/02, B23K37/053, B23K26/28, B23K26/10, B23K26/24, B23K9/028 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
B23K37/0276 (EP);
B23K1/0012 (EP);
B23K1/0056 (EP);
B23K1/18 (EP);
B23K26/103 (EP);
B23K26/242 (EP);
B23K26/282 (EP);
B23K37/027 (EP);
B23K37/0531 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2012/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Fügeeinrichtung | [2015/38] | English: | Joint method and device | [2015/38] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'assemblage | [2015/38] |
Former [2012/35] | Fügeeinrichtung | ||
Former [2012/35] | Joint device | ||
Former [2012/35] | Dispositif d'assemblage | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 25.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2012 | AL | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | MT | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | IE | 28.02.2016 | LU | 28.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
LU | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
IE | 28.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2007055643 (EDLUND KENT [SE]) [X] 1,3-7,15 * page 3 - page 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,8,10-14 [I] 9; | [A]DE2708040 (BOC LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004039006 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004118897 (CALDARONE ANDREW C [US], et al) [A] 12-14 * figures 4,5,6 *; | [A]JPS55126393 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63154281 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |